HI HB2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the executive office on aging of the department of health to conduct an education and awareness campaign on long term care and have the campaign independently evaluated. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Kupuna Caucus; Long Term Care; Education and Awareness; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:30pm in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 12:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Carroll, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Takayama, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 462) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 925) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:25PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 71). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 02-05-13 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB103 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30