HI HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act 005, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act 005, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operating budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 20192020 and 20202021. (HB2 CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Act 005, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2019-04-15 | House | Act 005, on 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2019-03-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 511). |
2019-03-27 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 537). |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 03-27-19. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 1). |
2019-03-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 03-27-19. |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Nakamura. |
2019-03-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 03-22-19 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 533). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 504). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2019-03-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-03-18 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 530) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-15-19. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nakamura. |
2019-01-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 01-23-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |