HI HB200 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - (H) Act 164, on 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - (H) Act 164, on 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operating and capital improvement budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013. (HB200 CD1)
Title
State Budget
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | (H) Act 164, on 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). | |
2011-06-23 | (S) Act 164, 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, M. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto, Ward. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 4:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 7:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 7:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 7:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-20-11 7:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-19-11 7:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, M. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 436) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Pine, Riviere, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Marumoto, McKelvey, Morita, Nakashima excused (6). | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-09 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Morikawa, Riviere. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-09-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |