HI HB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Act 134, 6/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Act 134, 6/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates positions and funds for the operating and capital improvements program budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 20132014 and 20142015. Effective 7/1/2013. (HB200 HD1 SD1 CD1)
Title
State Budget ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Act 134, 6/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2013-06-20 | House | Act 134, on 6/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Johanson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 7:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 7:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-17-13 7:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-12 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-15-13 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-12-13 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-09 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 455). |
2013-04-09 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 473). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 459). |
2013-04-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Johanson, Ward. |
2013-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 447) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 377). |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fale, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Rhoads, Souki excused (2). |
2013-03-11 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Tokioka. |
2013-03-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-08-13 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-06 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-08-13. |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-06-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |