HI HB200 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the scope of condominium related disputes for which an apartment owner or the board of directors can mandate mediation. Lowers the additional annual condominium education trust fund fee, used to support costs of mediation, to 75 cents times the number of condominiums units included in a registered project or association and discourages future surpluses of the fee. Specifies that any surplus funds collected for the additional annual condominium education trust fund to support mediation may be used for any education purpose provided under section 514B-71(a), HRS. Amends the conditions that mandate mediation and exceptions to mandatory mediation.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 429. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17, at 10:30AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB121 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB121 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Arbitration
Condominium Association
Condominium Education Trust Fund
Condominiums
Dispute Resolution
Mediation
Condominium Association
Condominium Education Trust Fund
Condominiums
Dispute Resolution
Mediation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=200&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB200_.HTM |