HI HB200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits specified trolleys, pulleys, cables, or running lines designed to attach a dog to two stationary objects in a configuration that endangers the dog, including by depriving the dog of sustenance. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog under the age of six months unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a tow or log chain if the tow or log chain inhibits the free movement of the dog. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a choke collar, pinch collar, or prong collar unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Effective 7/1/2150. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cruelty To Animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Perruso, Wildberger, Okimoto.
2019-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 638).
2019-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-19-19 9:31AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 349).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 413) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB121 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback