HI HB200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits specified trolleys, pulleys, cables, or running lines designed to attach a dog to two stationary objects in a configuration that endangers the dog, including by depriving the dog of sustenance. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog under the age of six months unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a tow or log chain if the tow or log chain inhibits the free movement of the dog. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a choke collar, pinch collar, or prong collar unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Effective 7/1/2150. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cruelty To Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Perruso, Wildberger, Okimoto. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2019-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-19-19 9:31AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 349). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 413) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Carry Over) 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).