HI HB2002 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes requirements and permitting procedures for transportation network companies operating in the State. Makes permanent insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network drivers. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation Network Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to TRS, CPH/WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 158).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-10HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in conference room 423.
2020-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2808 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback