HI HB2003 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 703).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 703).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates, organizes, and clarifies current campaign financing laws. Effective upon approval. (SD2)
Title
Elections; Campaign Financing
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 703). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 465). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 628). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 616). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, M. Oshiro, Luke, B. Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-20-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-15-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 563). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 576). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Nishihara, Takamine. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Luke, B. Oshiro. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 471). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 497) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tsutsui . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Hooser, Ihara, Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 11 offered. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 03-30-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254). | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Bertram, Har, Pine, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Floor amendment adopted with none voting no and none excused. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 4 offered by Rep. C. Lee | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 2 withdrawn by Rep. Marumoto | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Marumoto | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Finnegan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-23-10 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-23-10. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Pine, Rhoads, Saiki, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Carroll, Herkes, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Morita, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Luke. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-10 2:30pm in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-10, 2:00 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 2/2/2010 2:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-02-10, 2:00 pm. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 1/28/2010 2:30:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 01-28-10. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-26-10 2:30 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |