HI HB201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 197, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that a state department that is a member of the invasive species council, counties, and its employees and authorized agents, have authority to enter private property to control and eradicate invasive species when there is a reasonable suspicion that invasive species are present on the property. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Invasive Species.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 197, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
2019-07-09HouseAct 197, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
2019-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871).
2019-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2).
2019-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 861).
2019-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04SenateOne Day Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-19SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 350).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 11
2019-01-22HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback