HI HB2012 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of tickets to an exhibition, game, concert, and other events at prices greater than the sum of the price printed on the ticket, any lawful taxes collected, and any reasonable charge for services. Specifies that no ticket sales for events in Hawaii shall commence before 8:00 a.m. Hawaiian standard time or before the primary ticket seller commences ticket sales, whichever is later. Specifies requirements for tickets sold or offered for sale by or through an internet website. Establishes requirements for disclosures relating to fees and taxes and number of available tickets. Establishes remedies. Makes the circumvention of online ticket purchases through the use of illicit computer software a misdemeanor. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD2)
Title
Event Ticket Sales Practices; Ticket Scalping; Price Limitations; Website Sales Requirements; Disclosures; Remedies; Unfair and Deceptive Practices; Circumvention of Online Ticket Purchase Processes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 at 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Taniguchi Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3298) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3019) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-18-14 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 290). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 667-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ito, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, C. Lee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | HD 1 adopted and recommitted to CPC for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommends recommittal to CPC. |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277-14) as amended in HD 1. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Evans, Har, Yamane. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |