HI HB2019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public contractors to post a post-performance bond to cover the State's costs of curing construction defects discovered within 10 years after the completion of the contract. Requires the contractor to fully pay for the bond prior to the completion of the contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Procurement Code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback