HI HB2021 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LHE/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the Department of Education may construct teachers' housing on a public school campus. Requires that teachers' housing units constructed or acquired on a school campus after 6/30/2020, be rented at a low cost or no cost to new teachers employed full-time at that school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Teacher Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23HouseReferred to LHE/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback