HI HB2024 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary Self-employment Assistance Program in the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations. Establishes benefits and requirements. Effective January 1, 2049. Repealed on June 30, 2015. (HB2024 HD1)
Title
Employment Security; Unemployment; Self-Employment Assistance Program
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 117). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Johanson. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-12 at 10:00am. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-21-12 10:45AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to LAB, referral sheet 3 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |