HI HB2024 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all motorized recreational vessels operating in nearshore waters to have properly functioning propeller guards. (HB2024 HD1)
Title
Marine Life; Recreational Vessels; Propeller Guards
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |