HI HB2024 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the circumstances where a minor may consent to no cost emergency shelter and related services to include cases where the provider is coordinating with child welfare services. Takes effect 12/31/2059. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2220 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback