HI HB2025 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 207, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 207, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Education to issue grants to establish a composting grant pilot project in Department of Education schools. Authorizes a composting grant pilot project working group. Requires report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (HB2025 CD1)
Title
Relating To Resource Recovery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 207, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 207, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Gabbard, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Woodson, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Gabbard, K. Kahele Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Woodson, Lowen Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 645) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3119) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-16-18 1:46PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-21-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-30-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |