HI HB2027 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a beverage dealer who is located in a high density population area from operating a redemption center if the dealer is located within 1 mile of a certified redemption center operated independently of the dealer.
Title
Relating To Deposit Beverage Containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2727 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2027&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2027_.HTM |