HI HB203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Keahole FBO I LLC with planning, designing, constructing, equipping, and operating facilities for aviation services and aviation-related services at Ellison Onizuka Kona International Airport at Keahole.
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Keahole Fbo I Llc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB203 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB652 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
SB652 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=203&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB203_.HTM |