HI HB2043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an unlicensed mental health professional, working under the supervision of a licensed mental health professional, to provide mental health treatment or counseling services to minors without parental or legal guardian consent, knowledge, or participation. Requires a mental health professional to ensure that the covered entity has been notified that minor-initiated mental health treatment or counseling services should not be disclosed. Requires a covered entity, upon notification that minor-initiated mental health treatment or counseling services should not be disclosed, to maintain the confidentiality of minor-initiated mental health treatment or counseling services. Takes effect 1/30/2021. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Adolescent Mental Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Riviere . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Matsumoto, McDermott voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Eli; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2277 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Confidentiality
Mental Health Professionals
Minor-Initiated Mental Health Treatment or Counseling Services
Minors
Mental Health Professionals
Minor-Initiated Mental Health Treatment or Counseling Services
Minors