HI HB2045 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public school that has a career and technical education requirement relating to health care workforce development to review all geographic exception applications and make a determination whether to allow students to enroll in career and technical education programs in schools outside the Department of Education service area in which the student resides. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health Care Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Johanson, Ohno. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:05PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Career and Technical Health Care Education Programs
DOE
Educational Choice
Health Care Workforce Development
Public Schools
DOE
Educational Choice
Health Care Workforce Development
Public Schools