HI HB2050 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the effective period of a temporary restraining order, protective order, or injunction restraining any party from contacting, threatening, or physically abusing a minor may extend to a date after the minor has reached 18 years of age. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Temporary Restraining Orders, Protective Orders, And Injunctions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20 at 2:15PM.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-31HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
2020-01-31HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-01-29HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2346 (Same As) 2020-02-21 - The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback