HI HB2066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a downpayment guarantee program for certain first-time homebuyers. Creates the loan loss reserve fund subaccount to fund the program. Creates two full time equivalent positions (2.0 FTE) to administer the program. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3631) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 398-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Homebuyer Downpayment Guarantee Program
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Homebuyer Downpayment Guarantee Program