HI HB2073 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for the purpose of planning, design, and construction a Hawaii Gulf War Memorial to be located at the Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery in Kaneohe, on the island of Oahu, and replicas of the memorial to be located at state veterans' cemeteries statewide. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Gulf War Memorial; Construction; Appropriation; GO Bonds ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 10:10AM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takai, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2949) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Green. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3047 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to PSM/TEC, WAM.