HI HB2073 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSH/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSH/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows property owners to temporarily lease space to individuals to camp or otherwise occupy space on the property, so long as no health and safety ordinances are violated.
Title
Relating To Affordable Temporary Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HSH/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH/HSG, WLH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2073&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2073_.HTM |