HI HB2088 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a working group to create a state plan to make FAFSA completion a statewide graduation requirement and an opt-out waiver for FAFSA completion by the 2022-2023 school year. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Morikawa.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2296 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback