HI HB2091 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the University of Hawaii to conduct criminal history record checks on current or prospective employees, and contractors and their employees, whose duties include ensuring security of campus facilities and persons. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal History Record Checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3671) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 61). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 537-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-20 2:01pm. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-10-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-29 | House | Re-referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |