HI HB2097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 181, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 181, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Attorney General to defend any civil action or proceeding against a county and any person employed by the county to provide lifeguard services at a designated state beach park under an agreement between the State and the county. Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to contract with the counties for county lifeguard services at designated state beach parks under an agreement between the State and a county. (HB2097 CD1)
Title
Relating To Lifeguards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 181, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 181, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 116-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 116-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Johanson, Nishimoto, Todd, Hashimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 662). |
2018-04-23 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Hashimoto added as Conferee. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Nishimoto, Todd Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 660) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3555) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3112) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 71). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-15-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 263-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |