HI HB2097 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Health to consider processes that may allow cannabis or manufactured cannabis products that fail testing to be remediated. Allows the Department of Health to allow licensed dispensaries to provide educational and scientific information and sponsor events related to medical cannabis. Takes effect 1/1/2021. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 589) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3758) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016.
2020-05-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-13SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-11SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDC.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 173).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-27HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in conference room 308.
2020-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
2020-02-06HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 161-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2024 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback