HI HB2101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires circuit courts to apply special sentencing considerations when sentencing a minor for a nonviolent offense. Allows the circuit courts, in their discretion, to impose a sentence up to fifty per cent shorter than the mandatory minimum or to decline to impose a mandatory enhanced sentence in certain circumstances. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3623) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 315). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Say, Thielen. |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-28-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-20 at 2:01PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |