HI HB2109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain penalties for the crimes of assault, burglary, criminal property damage, and theft by one grade.
Title
Relating To Criminal Penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-13-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2109&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2109_.HTM |