HI HB2120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain parts of the conflicts of interests law of the state ethics code to include members of the legislature. Clarifies that the conflicts of interests law does not prohibit a legislator from introducing legislation, serving on a committee, making statements, or taking action in the exercise of their legislative functions. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The State Ethics Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Say, Thielen. |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-28-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-20 at 2:01PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |