HI HB2126 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process, beginning on January 1, 2021, for preregistering or registering public school- and charter school-enrolled students to vote.
Title
Relating To Voter Registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-03-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2126&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2126_.HTM |