HI HB2138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the aggregate cap amount of the tax credit for research activities. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2545 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:35AM in conference room 309.