HI HB2149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home-schooled, high school-age students to participate as unattached competitors in individual sports available to the public school that the student would otherwise be required to attend. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Individual Sports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Morikawa. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |