HI HB2162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the fees tow companies may charge. Clarifies the duties of tow companies when vehicle owners arrive on the scene while their vehicles are in the process of being hooked up. Requires tow and storage companies to accept credit cards and debit cards. Subjects violations of the towing statute to the penalties and remedies under the State's unfair or deceptive acts or practices law and consumer protection law. Adds definitions for clarity. Effective 10/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Towing.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 591) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3760) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Reported from TRS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS/CPH, JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 69). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20 at 2:15PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-03 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 320. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2639 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36