HI HB2166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the law exempting the University Laboratory School from the public charter school enrollment policy so that it may conform its student enrollment profile to the standard prescribed by the University of Hawaii college of education in order to meet college's research requirements.
Title
Relating To The University Laboratory School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-07-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2166&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2166_.HTM |