HI HB2169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 324, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1441).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 324, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1441).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a peer review process for public accounting firms that engage in attest work. (SD1)
Title
Public Accountancy; Peer Review; Attest
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 324, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1441). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 324, on 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1441). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 644). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 632). | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-03-12 | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 354). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3061) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-12 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-29-12 12:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Souki, Ching, Marumoto. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-12 2:01PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-12. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-13-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused (2). | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 01-31-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to ERB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |