HI HB2175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 072, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 072, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that membership of certain metropolitan planning organization include on its policy board at least one member of the senate and one member of the house of representatives from that metropolitan planning area. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Metropolitan Planning Organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Act 072, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2018-07-05 | House | Act 072, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 706). |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 702). |
2018-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamashita, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 3:01PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara, Espero, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3515) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3198) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-18 10:15AM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 10:00AM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2694 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM.