HI HB2183 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the Hula Mae Multifamily Revenue Bond authorization ceiling amount to continue financing affordable rental housing statewide. Effective 7/1/2025. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Housing Loan And Mortgage Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 321).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 85-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback