HI HB2208 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 199, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 199, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires association health plan policies to comply with the laws of this State regardless of the association's domicile. Enables certain voluntary associations, including employer associations that issue association health plans, to qualify for authorization to transact insurance in the State. (HB2208 CD1)
Title
Relating To Association Health Plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 199, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 199, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Ichiyama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ruderman, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 687) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |