HI HB2220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of financial exploitation of an elder and provides enhanced penalties. Amends mandatory reporting requirements for suspected financial abuse of an elder. Requires DHS to share records with the appropriate county police departments or offices of the prosecuting attorney. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-16-20 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 322). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |