HI HB224 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to develop annual assessments in the Hawaiian language in language arts and mathematics for students in grades three through six, and in science for students in grade four in the Hawaiian Language Immersion Program. Makes an appropriation. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaiian Language Immersion Program; Student Assessment; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-24-13 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:30PM in conference room 321. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Tokuda, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takumi, Hanohano, Ing Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fale. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2013-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 425) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-13. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from THA/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to THA/EDU, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:50AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EDN, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |