HI HB2252 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for certain transit-oriented development projects.
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2809 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2252&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2252_.HTM |