HI HB2264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 035, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 035, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the limitation on the holding period for real estate acquired by the Employees' Retirement System by foreclosure, enforcement of security, or in satisfaction of debts.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 035, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 035, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2014-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 500). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3400) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2979) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Ihara. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 177). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-31-14 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2813 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).