HI HB2265 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the invasive species rapid response special fund. Establishes procedures for emergency declarations and expenditures. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-13-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |