HI HB23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB23
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a disaster preparedness plan to accompany each declaration for a new condominium property regime submitted for recordation after December 31, 2019. Requires each managing agent for each condominium property regime created before January 1, 2020, to prepare a disaster preparedness plan. (HB23 HD1)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.