HI HB230 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for containment and prevention of the spread of pathogens causing rapid ohia death in Kauai county, including funds to be used in collaboration with the Research Corporation of the University of Hawaii and the Kauai Invasive Species Council.
Title
Relating To Rapid Ohia Death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=230&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB230_.HTM |