HI HB2312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies benefits to alternate payees, advisory review determinations of Hawaii domestic relations orders, and the priority of multiple orders. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Qualified Domestic Relations Orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:20AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2868 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:10AM in conference room 309.