HI HB2353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 171, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 171, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes miscellaneous technical amendments to facilitate library operations. Changes references to the Hawaii State Library Foundation to the Friends of the Library of Hawaii. Clarifies the functions of the Friends of the Library of Hawaii program fund. (HB2353 CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Libraries.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 171, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 171, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Todd, Hashem, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Todd Co-Chairs; Hashem, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 711) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3642) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 95). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2780 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.